MS HB1661 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Approving The Expenditure Of Special Funds For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Pat Harrison Waterway District For The Fiscal Year 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; Pat Harrison Waterway District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 106 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Approved by Governor
2019-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-18SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-14SenatePassed
2019-03-13SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-20SenateReferred To Appropriations
2019-02-20HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-19HousePassed
2019-02-19HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-18HouseReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback