MS HB1642 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-05 - Veto Sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Mississippi Department Of Insurance For The Fiscal Year 2011.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; Insurance Department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-20 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 106 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-05 - House - House Veto Sustained (Y: 68 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-05 Veto Sustained
2010-01-05 Override Governor's Veto
2010-01-04 Veto Referred To Appropriations
2010-05-13 Partially Vetoed By Governor
2010-04-27 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-04-27 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-04-20 Conference Report Adopted
2010-04-20 Conference Report Adopted
2010-04-20 Motion to Recommit Lost
2010-04-20 Conference Report Filed
2010-04-20 Conference Report Filed
2010-03-25 Suspend from Deadlines by HC 121
2010-03-22 Conferees Named Nunnelee,Jackson (15th),Burton
2010-03-19 Conferees Named Stringer,Dickson,Dedeaux
2010-03-18 Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
2010-03-17 Returned For Concurrence
2010-03-16 Passed As Amended
2010-03-16 Amended
2010-03-09 Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
2010-02-19 Referred To Appropriations
2010-02-19 Transmitted To Senate
2010-02-18 Motion to Reconsider Tabled
2010-02-17 Motion to Reconsider Entered
2010-02-17 Passed As Amended
2010-02-17 Amended
2010-02-16 Read the Third Time
2010-02-16 Title Suff Do Pass
2010-02-15 Referred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback