MS HB162 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 31-7-14, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes Certain Entities To Enter Into Public Contracts For Energy Efficiency Services And Equipment And Prescribes Certain Requirements Relating To Such Contracts, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Section; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public contracts of energy efficiency services; extend repealer on authority and certain requirements for.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Energy |
2021-02-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed |
2021-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred To Energy |