MS HB1608 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds For Repair And Renovation Of And Upgrades And Improvements To State-owned Emergency Alert Transmission Towers And Related Facilities In The Municipalities Of Bude, Meridian, Inverness, Raymond, Oxford, And Booneville, Mississippi, The Mchenry Community In Stone County, Mississippi, And At Mississippi State University; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bonds; authorize issuance improvements to certain state-owned emergency alert transmission towers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateDied In Committee
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Finance
2019-02-21HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-20HousePassed
2019-02-19HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-13HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback