MS HB1596 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-25 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-25 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-115-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase By $50,000,000.00 The Aggregate Amount Of Investment Tax Credits That May Be Allocated To Participating Investors Of Mississippi Small Business Investment Companies Under The Mississippi Small Business Investment Company Act; To Provide The Taxable Years In Which A Participating Investor May Claim The Additional Credits So Allocated Against His Premium Tax Liability; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Small Business Investment Company Act; increase the amount of investment tax credits that may be allocated under.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-25 | House | Died In Conference |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Parks |
2017-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Smith,Hood,White |
2017-03-16 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2017-02-22 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed |
2017-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |