MS HB158 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-31-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definitions Of All-terrain Vehicles And Recreational Off-highway Vehicles For The Purposes Of The Statute Regulating The Operation Of Off-road Vehicles; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Off-road vehicles; revise definitions of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2022-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-04 | House | Referred To Transportation |