MS HB1570 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds To Assist The City Of Gulfport, Mississippi, In Paying Costs Associated With The Construction Of An Aquarium Facility In The City Of Gulfport; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bonds; authorize the issuance of general obligation bonds for an aquarium located in the City of Gulfport.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-24 - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-17SenateDied In Committee
2015-02-26SenateReferred To Finance
2015-02-25HouseTransmitted To Senate
2015-02-24HousePassed
2015-02-24HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2015-02-24HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2015-02-18HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback