MS HB1565 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 909, Local And Private Laws Of 1999, As Last Amended By Chapter 928, Local And Private Laws Of 2019, To Extend The Date Of Repeal From July 1, 2022, To July 1, 2026, On The Provisions Of Law That Create The Jackson Convention And Visitors Bureau And Impose A Tax On The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants, Hotels And Motels For The Purpose Of Providing Funds For The Bureau; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Jackson; extend repeal date on convention and visitors bureau.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Passed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2022-03-16 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-03-15 | House | Passed |
2022-03-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |