MS HB1556 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds For Improvements To The Department Of Revenue Liquor Distribution Center In Madison County, Mississippi; To Provide That The Principal Of And Interest On The Bonds Will Be Paid Primarily From Monies In A Bond Sinking Fund Created In This Act; To Impose A Handling Fee On Each Manufacturer Or Wholesaler Of Alcoholic Beverages Whose Product Is Placed In The Department Of Revenue Liquor Distribution Center; To Provide That Revenue Derived From The Handling Fee Shall Be Placed Into The Bond Sinking Fund Created For The Payment Of Bonds Issued Under This Act; To Amend Section 27-71-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bonds; authorize issuance for improvements to the Department of Revenue liquor distribution center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 75 N: 36 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2018-02-21 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-21 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2018-02-15 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Smith, Lamar) |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed |
2018-02-13 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |