MS HB1556 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact And Amend Sections 27-7-22.25 And 27-7-22.26, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide An Income Tax Credit For Certain Taxpayers That Use The Airport Facilities At Public Airports For Certain Charges Paid By The Taxpayer On The Export Or Import Of Cargo And Require The Mississippi Development Authority To Report Annually To The Legislature Regarding The Impact Of The Tax Credit; To Reflect The Name Change Of The State Tax Commission To Department Of Revenue In Conformity With The Agency's Reorganization; To Amend Section 3, Chapter 442, Laws Of 2005, As Last Amended By Section 6, Chapter 377, Laws Of 2012, To Extend The Date Of Repeal Of Sections 27-7-22.25 And 27-7-22.26, Mississippi Code Of 1972; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income tax; extend repealer on tax credit for certain charges at airports used for export/import of cargo.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason White [R] | Rep. John Hines [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2016-02-18 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-02-17 | House | Passed |
2016-02-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |