MS HB1551 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Approving The Expenditure Of Special Funds For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Pearl River Valley Water Supply District For The Fiscal Year 2016.
Title
Appropriation; Pearl River Valley Water Supply District.
Sponsors
Rep. Herb Frierson [R] | Rep. Casey Eure [R] | Rep. Richard Bennett [R] | Sen. Scott DeLano [R] |
Rep. John Read [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-29 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2015-03-29 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2015-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Gollott,Blount |
2015-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Frierson,Eure,Barker |
2015-03-19 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2015-02-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-02-17 | House | Amended |
2015-02-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-02-16 | House | Referred To Appropriations |