MS HB1547 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 41-29-113, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Schedule I Of The Controlled Substances Act To Include Certain Synthetic Cannabinoids, Fentanyls And Fentanyl-like Substances That Have No Accepted Medical Use; To Amend Section 41-29-115, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Amend Schedule Ii To Exclude Naldemedine; To Amend Section 41-29-121, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Schedule V To Include A Cannabinoid That Has Been Approved As A Legend Drug By The Federal Food And Drug Administration; To Create A Task Force To Study The Cultivation Of Hemp And Make Recommendations; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances; revise Schedules I, II, and V.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 98 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16 Approved by Governor
2019-04-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-04-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-28SenateConference Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseConference Report Filed
2019-03-27SenateConference Report Filed
2019-03-27SenateConferees Named Hopson,Simmons (12th),Fillingane
2019-03-19HouseConferees Named Willis,Hood,Horan
2019-03-18HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-18SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-13SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-13SenateAmended
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2019-02-14HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-12HousePassed As Amended
2019-02-12HouseAmended
2019-02-08HouseRead the Third Time
2019-02-04HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Drug Policy

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/HB/HB1547.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1500-1599/HB1547IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1500-1599/HB1547PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1500-1599/HB1547SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/HB1547_H_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/HB1547_H_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1547_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1547_S_Amend_01_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1547_S_Amend_02_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1547_S_Amend_03_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0360021.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0650025.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0800017.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0800018.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback