MS HB1542 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Department Of Public Safety For The Purpose Of Providing Funds For The Mississippi Law Enforcement And Fire Fighters Premium Pay Program, As Created In House Bill No. 1427, 2022 Regular Session, For The Fiscal Year 2023.
Title
Appropriation; additional to DPS for the Mississippi Law Enforcement and Fire Fighters Premium Pay Program.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. William Arnold [R] | Rep. Jerry Turner [R] | Rep. Jeff Hale [R] |
Rep. Fred Shanks [R] | Rep. Sonya Williams-Barnes [D] | Rep. De Stamps [D] | Rep. Carolyn Crawford [R] |
Rep. Robert Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89 | |
2022-03-27 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Polk,DeBar |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Oliver,White |
2022-03-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-22 | House | Amended |
2022-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-02 | House | Referred To Appropriations |