MS HB1542 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning, Acting On Behalf Of The University Of Southern Mississippi, To Enter Into A Services Agreement For The Operation, Repairs And Maintenance And/or Capital Improvements Of All Or Any Portion Of The University Utility System; To Provide That Such Agreement Shall Not Exceed 50 Years; To Provide That The Agreement Entered Into By The Board Shall Be Protected From Actions Of Successor Boards Based On The Binding Successor Doctrine; And For Related Purposes.
Title
IHL; authorize to enter into services agreements for certain repairs, maintenance and capitol improvements of a university utility system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Appropriations |
2020-03-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed |
2020-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-27 | House | DR - TSDP: WM To UC |
2020-02-26 | House | DR - TSDP: UC To WM |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Ways and Means |