MS HB1526 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Mississippi Auctioneers Commission For The Fiscal Year 2016.
Title
Appropriation; Auctioneers Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-19 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2015-02-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-02-17 | House | Amended |
2015-02-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-02-16 | House | Referred To Appropriations |