MS HB1526 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-3-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow Supplemental Pay For A District Attorney In An Amount Not To Exceed $8,300.00 Which May Be Paid From Any Source, Other Than The State Treasury; And For Related Purposes.
Title
DA, asst. DA and criminal investigators; allow salaries to be supplemented by nonstate funds to be supplemented.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Referred To Fees, Salaries and Administration | |
2010-02-10 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-08 | Passed | |
2010-02-08 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-01-28 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Fees and Salaries of Public Officers |