MS HB1517 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Office Of Workforce Development, With The Department Of Employment Security Serving As The Fiscal Agent, To Be Distributed To Community Colleges, Institutions Of Higher Learning, Local School Districts, And Industry Partners For Short-term Training Programs, Equipment, Supplies, And Belated Expenses Necessary To Support Such Short-term Training Programs And To Increase The Capacity Of Training Programs That Are Already In Place, So That Employees And Others Who Have Been Displaced Due To The Covid-19 Public Health Emergency Can Be More Competitive And Trained For The Job Market That Emerges After The Covid-19 Public Health Emergency, For On The Job Training And For Certain Administrative Fees; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Appropriation; Office of Workforce Development for various activities and programs.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. Jerry Turner [R] | Rep. Jeff Hale [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-04-04 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-04-01 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89 | |
2022-03-27 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Polk,Parker |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Oliver,White |
2022-03-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-18 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-17 | House | Amended |
2022-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Appropriations |