MS HB1515 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Support And Maintenance Of The State Forestry Commission And For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Mississippi Institute For Forest Inventory For The Fiscal Year 2018.
Title
Appropriation; Forestry Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 95 N: 9 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 104 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 104 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Carmichael,Michel |
2017-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Read,Sullivan,Ladner |
2017-03-16 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2017-02-16 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed |
2017-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred To Appropriations |