MS HB1514 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Department Of Rehabilitation Services For Fiscal Year 2018.
Title
Appropriation; Rehabilitation Services, Department of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 65 N: 45 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 104 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 104 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2017-03-27 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Hughes, Read, Huddleston (15th)) |
2017-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Motion to Recommit Lost |
2017-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Wiggins,Hill |
2017-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Read,Mims,Bounds |
2017-03-16 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2017-02-16 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed |
2017-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred To Appropriations |