MS HB1512 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create Eleven Special Funds In The State Treasury With One Fund For The Geographical Area Of Each Of The Ten Planning And Development Districts Excluding Hancock, Harrison And Jackson Counties, And One Fund For Hancock, Harrison And Jackson Counties To Be Designated As The "gulf Coast Restoration Fund"; To Provide That The Monies In Each Of The Special Funds Shall Be Administered By The Mississippi Development Authority (mda) And Shall Be Used By Mda, Upon Appropriation By The Legislature, To Provide Assistance To Applicants For Projects Authorized By This Act; To Specify The Applicants Who Are Eligible For Assistance Under This Act; To Provide That Mda Shall Establish Criteria, Rules And Procedures For Accepting, Reviewing And Granting Or Denying Applications For Assistance Under This Act; To Provide A Timeline For Submissions Of Applications To Mda, For Review, Evaluation And Scoring Of Applications By Mda, And For Presentation Of The Applications To The Appropriate Legislative Advisory Committee For Its Evaluation And Recommendations; To Provide That Applications For Assistance Under This Act Will Be Received Through A Web Portal Set Up By Mda; To Establish Legislative Advisory Committees For The Geographic Area Of Each Of The Ten Planning And Development Districts And For The Gulf Coast Restoration Fund, Which Will Serve Only In An Advisory Capacity In Reviewing And Evaluating Applications For Assistance Under This Act; To Provide That The Legislative Advisory Committees Will Meet Annually To Review And Evaluate The Projects Being Considered For Funding By Mda; To Provide That Mda Will Call The Meetings Of The Legislative Advisory Committee, Notify The Committee Members Of The Meeting And Chair The Meeting; To Provide That Mda Will Have The Final Decision Regarding The Application For Assistance; To Prohibit Mda From Approving Any Application For Assistance Or Funding Any Project Until After The Legislative Advisory Committee Has Reviewed And Evaluated The Application; To Authorize Mda To Make Loans, Loan Guarantees, Grants And Any Other Financial Assistance Under This Act To Applicants Whose Projects Are Approved For Assistance By Mda; To Direct Mda To Establish A Scoring Process For The Selection Of Projects That Have The Potential To Generate Increased Economic Activity In The Counties Involved, And To Specify The Types Of Projects For Which Assistance May Be Made; To Provide For Financial Audits And Operational Audits Of Recipients Of Assistance Under This Act; To Direct Mda To File An Annual Report With The Governor And The Legislature That Includes Detailed Information Regarding Receipts And Expenditures Of The Funds Received And Provided As Assistance Under This Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BP settlement funds; provide for distribution to applicants for assistance for projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-27SenateDied In Committee
2018-02-16SenateReferred To Appropriations
2018-02-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2018-02-07HousePassed As Amended
2018-02-07HouseAmended
2018-02-06HouseRead the Third Time
2018-01-30HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2018-01-15HouseReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback