MS HB1500 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 45-6-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Board On Law Enforcement Officer Standards And Training To Consider Certain Military Training When Determining Whether An Applicant Has Satisfied Certain Requirements In Order To Be Qualified For Appointment Or Employment As A Law Enforcement Officer; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Board on law enforcement officer standards and training; authorize to consider certain military training when determining qualification of applicant.
Sponsors
Rep. Jill Ford [R] | Rep. Jansen Owen [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-01 | Senate | DR - TSDP: VM To JB |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Veterans and Military Affairs;Judiciary, Division B |
2020-03-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed |
2020-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |