MS HB1499 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Governor's Office - Division Of Medicaid For The Purpose Of Providing Medical Assistance Under The Mississippi Medicaid Law And Defraying The Expenses Of The Administration Of Such Law For The Fiscal Year 2012.
Title
Appropriation; Medicaid, Division of.
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Brown [D] | Rep. Mary Coleman [D] | Rep. Dirk Dedeaux [D] | Rep. George Flaggs [D] |
Rep. Karl Gibbs [D] | Rep. John Hines [D] | Rep. Stephen Holland [D] | Rep. Omeria Scott [D] |
Rep. Mary Ann Stevens [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-05 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2011-04-04 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-31 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 145 | |
2011-03-18 | Conferees Named Davis,Burton,Frazier | |
2011-03-16 | Conferees Named Stringer,Holland,Dedeaux | |
2011-03-11 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-10 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-09 | Amended | |
2011-03-08 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-21 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2011-02-17 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-16 | Passed | |
2011-02-15 | Read the Third Time | |
2011-02-15 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-02-15 | Referred To Appropriations |