MS HB1494 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 991, Local And Private Laws Of 1998, As Amended By Chapter 915, Local And Private Laws Of 2013, As Amended By Chapter 913, Local And Private Laws Of 2019, To Authorize The Walnut Grove Correctional Authority To Contract With The State Of Mississippi For The Operation Of The Walnut Grove Correctional Facility; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Walnut Grove; authorize Walnut Grove Correctional Authority to contract with the state to operate correctional facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-27 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 108 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 100 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 100 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-27 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2021-03-18 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-03-18 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-03-18 | House | Passed |
2021-03-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |