MS HB1480 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 947, Local And Private Laws Of 2011, As Amended By Chapter 950, Local And Private Laws Of 2012, As Amended By Chapter 920, Local And Private Laws Of 2013, To Expand The Boundaries Of The Marshall Utility Services Sewer District; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Marshall County; expand boundaries of Marshall Utility Services Sewer District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2021-03-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed |
2021-03-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |