MS HB1477 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Sections 19-7-39 And 21-37-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Counties And Municipalities, In Their Discretion, To Expend Funds For The Maintenance And Repair Of Abandoned Public And Private Nonprofit Cemeteries; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cemeteries; authorize counties and municipalities to expend funds to maintain abandoned nonprofit cemeteries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Approved by Governor
2019-03-15SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-12HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2019-03-11SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-07SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-07SenateAmended
2019-03-04SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-27SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2019-02-15HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-13HousePassed
2019-02-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-05HouseDR - TSDP: MU To CA
2019-02-04HouseDR - TSDP: CA To MU
2019-01-21HouseReferred To County Affairs;Municipalities

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback