MS HB1476 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-807, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Time For Filing Campaign Finance Reports When Those Reports Are Filed Electronically Or With A Fax Machine; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Campaign finance reports; revise the time for filing electronically.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Elections;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2022-02-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-07 | House | Passed |
2022-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |