MS HB1456 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-5-49, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Mississippi Law Enforcement Escort Of Superload Vehicles To Promote Safety And Efficiency On Mississippi Highways; To Amend Section 27-19-81, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Agency Performing The Escort To Charge A Reasonable Fee For The Escort; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Superload vehicles; authorize law enforcement to escort and to charge reasonable fee for escort.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2020-03-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed |
2020-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Transportation |