MS HB1456 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 27-35-50, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Certain Provisions Regarding Use Of An Income Capitalization Approach As A Criteria For The Calculation Of True Value For Land Used For Agricultural Purposes; To Provide That The Fact That Land Is Leased For Hunting Or Fishing Purposes Shall Not Preclude The Land From Being Deemed To Be Used For Agricultural Purposes; To Provide That Income Derived From A Hunting Or Fishing Lease May Be Used In Combination With Other Relevant Criteria To Determine The True Value Of Land; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ad valorem tax; revise certain provisions regarding the determination of true value of land used for agricultural purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseDied In Conference
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Whaley
2019-03-19HouseConferees Named Smith,Lamar,Hood
2019-03-12HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-11SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-07SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-07SenateAmended
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Finance
2019-02-14HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-13HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2019-02-07HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Henley, Smith, Lamar)
2019-02-06HousePassed
2019-02-06HouseAmendment Failed
2019-02-06HouseAmended
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback