MS HB1440 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Natchez, Mississippi, And The Board Of Supervisors Of Adams County, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds To Natchez, Inc., A Mississippi Nonprofit Corporation Organized For Economic Development Purposes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Natchez and Adams County; authorize contributions to Natchez, Incorporated.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Johnson [D] | Rep. Sam Mims [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2022-01-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-01-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-01-27 | House | Passed |
2022-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |