MS HB1437 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The Town Of Byhalia, Mississippi, To Transfer Certain Surplus Funds From Its Gas System Revenue Fund To The Town's Water And Sewer Departments Fund For Infrastructure Improvements; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Town of Byhalia; authorize transfer of certain funds for infrastructure improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2021-03-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed |
2021-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |