MS HB1436 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Washington County, Mississippi, To Levy A Special Tax That Is Not To Exceed Two Mills Annually On All Real And Personal Property Within The Fire Protection Districts Of The County In Order To Operate, Maintain And Support Such Districts; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Washington County; authorize levy of special tax on real and personal property to support operation of fire protection districts.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hines [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2015-03-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-03-25 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-03-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-02-16 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |