MS HB1431 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 57-113-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of The Term "business Enterprise" For The Purpose Of Eligibility Of Aerospace Industries For Certain Tax Exemptions By Expanding The Operations Qualifying An Entity To Be Included In Such Definition, By Reducing The Minimum Capital Investment And Number Of Jobs Created Necessary For An Aerospace Enterprise To Be Included In Such Definition, And By Requiring The New Jobs Created To Provide A Certain Average Annual Salary; To Expand The Definition Of The Term "aerospace Industry"; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax exemptions; revise requirements that a business enterprise in the aerospace industry must meet to be eligible for.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Approved by Governor
2019-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-20SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-19SenatePassed
2019-03-18SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Finance
2019-02-21HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-20HousePassed
2019-02-19HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback