MS HB1430 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize A Beneficiary Designation That Transfers A Motor Vehicle At The Owner's Death; To Provide Definitions; To Provide For Requirement Of The Beneficiary Designation; To Provide The Procedure For Joint Owners; To Make Certain Requirements Of The Department Of Revenue And Authorize Rulemaking Authority To The Department; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Motor vehicle title; authorize beneficiary designation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Harkins,Johnson,Horhn |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Lamar,Steverson,Massengill |
2022-03-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Amended |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2022-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-02 | House | Passed |
2022-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |