MS HB1427 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds In The Amount Of $3,000,000.00 To Provide Funds For The Mississippi Site Development Grant Fund; To Amend Section 57-1-701, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds In The Amount Of $50,000,000.00 For The Ace Fund; To Amend Section 57-61-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase By $20,000,000.00 The Amount Of General Obligation Bonds That May Be Issued Under The Mississippi Business Investment Act; To Amend Section 57-61-36, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Amount Of Bond Proceeds That The Mississippi Development Authority May Utilize Under The Mississippi Business Investment Act To Make Grants Or Loans To Counties And Municipalities Through An Equipment And Public Facilities Grant And Loan Fund To Aid In Infrastructure-related Improvements, The Purchase Of Equipment And In The Purchase, Construction Or Repair And Renovation Of Public Facilities; To Amend Section 57-75-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase From $71,000,000.00 To $74,000,000.00 The Amount Of General Obligation Bonds That May Be Issued Under The Mississippi Major Economic Impact Act For Projects Designed To Enhance Facilities That Are At Risk For Closure Pursuant To The Base Closure And Realignment Act Of 1991 Or Other Applicable Federal Law; To Amend Section 65-4-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase By $10,000,000.00 The Amount Of Bonds Authorized To Be Issued Under The Economic Development Highway Act; To Amend Section 25, Chapter 533, Laws Of 2010, As Last Amended By Section 1, Chapter 1, Laws Of 2011 First Extraordinary Session, To Extend Until July 1, 2025, The Period Of Time During Which Bonds May Be Issued For The Mississippi Industry Incentive Financing Revolving Fund; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bonds; authorize issuance for various Mississippi Development Authority Programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Approved by Governor
2019-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-20SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-19SenatePassed
2019-03-18SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-28SenateReferred To Finance
2019-02-27HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-26HousePassed
2019-02-20HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback