MS HB1408 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-17-737, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Composition Of The Hancock County Utility Authority To Include The Mayors Of The Cities Of Bay St. Louis And Waveland And The President Of The Board Of Supervisors Of Hancock County Or Their Designees; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Hancock County Utility Authority; revise composition of board of directors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-15 | Conferees Named Moffatt,Dawkins,Baria | |
2010-03-10 | Conferees Named Mayo,DuVall,Bell | |
2010-03-09 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-05 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-04 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-04 | Amended | |
2010-02-25 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-15 | Referred To Environment Prot, Cons and Water Res | |
2010-02-11 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-09 | Passed | |
2010-02-09 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-01-28 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Conservation and Water Resources |