MS HB1381 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 67-1-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of The Term "qualified Resort Area" Under The Local Option Alcoholic Beverage Control Law; To Amend Section 67-1-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Alcoholic Beverages May Be Sold In Certain Qualified Resort Areas By Holders Of Package Retailer's Permits; To Amend Section 67-1-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Prohibition Against The Sale Or Consumption Of Alcoholic Beverages At Any Public Athletic Event At Any Public School, Community Or Junior College, College Or University; To Bring Forward Sections 67-1-14, 67-1-41 And 67-1-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Are Sections Of The Local Option Alcoholic Beverage Control Law, For The Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; revise definition of qualified resort area, revise provisions regarding certain permits and sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 97 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 97 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Harkins,Horhn,England |
2020-06-18 | House | Conferees Named Lamar,Steverson,Massengill |
2020-06-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2020-03-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-09 | House | Amended |
2020-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |