MS HB1378 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate A Certain Segment Of Mississippi Highway 130 Located In Prentiss County, Mississippi, As The "corporal Walter Gann Memorial Highway"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Memorial highways; designate in Prentiss County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-16 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2022-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-27 | House | DR - TSDPCS: AP To TR |
2022-01-26 | House | DR - TSDPCS: TR To AP |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Transportation;Appropriations |