MS HB1376 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create New Section 43-15-12, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Establish Qualified Residential Treatment Programs As Alternative Placements For Children And Youth Who Are In The Custody Of The Mississippi Department Of Child Protection Services; To Define The Terms "qualified Residential Treatment Programs (qrtp)" And "qualified Assessors"; To Provide The Duties Of A Qualified Assessor As It Relates To Qrtp Placement Of A Child; To Provide Certain Duties Of The Court After A Child Is Placed In Qrtp Placement; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Qualified residential treatment programs; authorize certain youth in Child Protection Services to be placed in.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-17 Approved by Governor
2024-04-09SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2024-04-08HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2024-04-04SenateReturned For Enrolling
2024-04-03SenatePassed
2024-03-26SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2024-03-19SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare
2024-03-13HouseTransmitted To Senate
2024-03-12HousePassed
2024-03-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2024-02-19HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback