MS HB1376 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Consumer Privacy Act For State Agencies; To Provide That Any Records That Include The Address, Telephone Number, Electronic Mail Address, Date Of Birth Or Social Security Number Of Any Licensee And Are Held By A State Agency That Licenses Professions Or Occupations Shall Not Be Deemed Public Records, Unless That Licensee Has Consented To The Release Of Such Information; To Provide Limited Situations When Personal Information Obtained By The Mississippi Department Of Revenue In Connection With A Motor Vehicle Record May Be Disclosed To Any Requestor By The Department; To Provide Penalties For The Improper Use Of Personal Information; To Provide That Whenever The Department Provides A Requestor Access To Personal Information In Bulk Under A Contract, The Contract Shall Require Certain Information; To Provide That Any Records Held By The Mississippi Department Of Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks That Include Certain Personal Information Of A Person Who Has Done Business With The Department Shall Not Be Public Records; To Bring Forward Section 49-7-4, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Consumer Privacy Act; create to prohibit any agency, department or institution from releasing any personal information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2022-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Banking and Financial Services |