MS HB1372 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-1-208, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Commissioner Of Public Safety To Authorize Certain Third Parties To Administer The Knowledge And Skills Test Required For A Commercial Driver's License; To Amend Section 63-1-211, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Cdl Renewals Shall Be Available To Be Performed Online Except For In Certain Circumstances; To Require The Department Of Public Safety To Upload Medical Card Information And Notify License Holders Within A Certain Amount Of Time; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Commercial driver's license; revise various laws regarding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2020-03-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Transportation |