MS HB1367 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish A Process For The Removal Of Discriminatory Provisions From Recorded Instruments Of Conveyance; To Authorize A Person Who Owns Real Property Or An Interest In Real Property Which Includes In The Chain Of Title A Recorded Instrument Of Conveyance Containing A Discriminatory Provision To Petition The Chancery Court Requesting The Removal Of The Discriminatory Provision; To Create A Form For The Petition; To Authorize The Chancery Court To Make Findings Of Fact And Conclusions Of Law Solely On A Review Of The Conveyance Instrument; To Create A Suggested Form For The Chancellor's Findings; To Direct The Chancery Clerk To Index And File The Court's Findings In The County Land Records Using The Same Names Used To Index The Conveyance Instrument; To Prohibit The Chancery Clerk From Collecting A Fee For Filing The Petition And The Court's Findings; To Amend Section 37-113-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Eliminate The Use Of The Term "negro" In The Statute Authorizing The Mississippi State University Extension Service To Establish A 4-h Club Camp In Madison County; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Real property; establish process to remove discriminatory language from recorded instruments of conveyance.
Sponsors
Rep. Jansen Owen [R] | Rep. Kent McCarty [R] | Rep. Shanda Yates [I] | Rep. Christopher Bell [D] |
Rep. Kabir Karriem [D] | Rep. De Stamps [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2022-02-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-14 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2022-02-10 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Hobgood-Wilkes, Cockerham, Reynolds) |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-09 | House | Amended |
2022-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |