MS HB1357 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create "the Uniform Partition Of Heirs Property Act";to Provide Definitions For Such; To Create A Uniform Procedure For Partition Of Property If Such Property Is Heir Property; To Provide That This Act Supplements Sections 11-21-1 Through 11-21-45 Governing Partition Of Real Property; To Require Appraisal Of Property; To Create A Procedure For Such Appraisal; To Require Notice To All Interested Parties; To Authorize An Heir To Request A Partition By Sale Under This Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Uniform Partition of Heirs Property Act; create procedures to enact.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseDied On Calendar
2019-02-08HouseRead the Third Time
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Judiciary A

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback