MS HB1351 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 89-5-8, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Regulate The Execution Of Scrivener's Error Affidavits For Property Deeds; To Create The "mississippi Architects And Engineers Good Samaritan Act"; To Provide Immunity From Liability For Any Civil Actions Arising From Work Performed By Architects Or Engineers At The Request Of An Elected Official During A State Of Emergency; To Provide That The Immunity Provided By This Act Shall Only Apply To Safety Assessment Services; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Affidavit of Scrivener's Error; revise recording of.
Sponsors
Rep. Jansen Owen [R] | Rep. De Stamps [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-26 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,McCaughn,Branning |
2022-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Cockerham,Lamar,Brown (20th) |
2022-03-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2022-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed |
2022-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |