MS HB135 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 37-159-1, 37-159-5, 37-159-7, 37-159-9, 37-159-11, 37-159-13 And 37-159-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Constitute The Mississippi Critical Teacher Shortage Act Of 1998 And Include The University Assisted Teacher Recruitment And Retention Grant Program, The Mississippi Employer-assisted Housing Teacher Program, And A Pilot Program To Provide For The Construction Of Rental Housing For Teachers In West Tallahatchie School District; To Amend Reenacted Sections 37-159-1 And 37-159-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Nonsubstantive Revisions To Outdated Statutory Language; To Amend Section 37-159-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Mississippi Critical Teacher Shortage Act Of 1998; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Critical Teacher Shortage Act of 1998; extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Turner [R] | Rep. Otis Anthony [D] | Rep. Abe Hudson [D] | Rep. Dana Underwood McLean [R] |
Rep. Noah Sanford [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Education |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed |
2021-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred To Education |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 159 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 159 | 11 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 159 | 13 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 159 | 17 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 159 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 159 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 159 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 159 | 9 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |