MS HB1336 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish The "mississippi Learn To Earn Act"; To Define Terms; To Require The State Board Of Education, In Conjunction With The Department Of Employment Security, The State Workforce Investment Board And The Mississippi Community College Board, To Identify High-school-to-work Apprenticeships And Other Student Internship Programs That May Be Eligible For Exemptions From Federal And State Labor Laws And Regulations For Which Exemptions Are Available For Student Apprenticeship Programs, And Establish Procedures By Which Such Exemptions May Be Obtained By Such Programs; To Authorize The State Board Of Education To Substitute Industry Certification And State Licensure Examinations For Any Other State Assessments For The Purpose Of Awarding Elective Credit For Career And Technical Education Courses; To Allow A Student Who Earns Credit Upon Completion Of A Registered Apprenticeship Program To Use Such Credit To Satisfy High School Graduation Requirements; To Require The State Board Of Education To Develop Guidelines For The Establishment Of High-school-to-work Apprenticeships Between Public High Schools And Local Businesses; To Require The State Board Of Education To Authorize Local School Boards To Develop An Extended Learning Opportunity To Include Alternative Educational Opportunities Available To Students In Grade 9 Through Grade 12 And To Adopt A Policy To Include Alternative Educational Opportunities For Course Credit That Recognizes Learning Opportunities Outside Of The Traditional Classroom; To Provide For A Two-tiered Application Process For The Implementation Of Alternative Learning Courses, Program Or Opportunities And Apprenticeships In Local School Districts; To Require The State Department Of Education To Provide An Annual Report On Districts Providing Alternative Courses, Programs And Opportunities Or Apprenticeships; To Require State Licensing Authorities To Grant A License To Any Student Applicant Who Participates In An Alternative Learning Course, Program Or Opportunity Or Apprenticeship Program And Satisfies The Licensing Requirement For Said Occupation Upon Certain Conditions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Mississippi Learn to Earn Act"; enact to authorize the earning of graduation credit through apprenticeships and other alternative courses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-17 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amended |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Education |
2020-03-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed |
2020-03-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Education |