MS HB1328 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-3-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Mississippi Industries For The Blind To Enter Into Agreements And Contracts With Different Entities And Agree To The Terms Of Indemnification, The Law Of Another State Or Jurisdiction Or Other Such Terms If It Determines That The Agreements And Contracts Would Be In Its Best Interests; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Industries for the Blind; revise authority to enter into certain agreements and contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2022-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed |
2022-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |