MS HB1328 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Warrants Task Force; To Provide The Purpose Of The Task Force; To Provide Duties For The Task Force; To Require A Report Of Recommendations From The Task Force To The Speaker Of The Mississippi House Of Representatives And The Lieutenant Governor By A Certain Date; To Provide How Members Of The Committee Are Compensated; And For Related Purposes.
Title
The MS Warrants Task Force; create to study the issuance and execution of warrants in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed |
2021-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |