MS HB1327 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 33-15-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definitions Of "state Of Emergency", "local Emergency" And "natural Emergency" In The Mississippi Emergency Management Law To Include "an Epidemic" And "a Pandemic"; To Amend Section 33-15-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Maximum Time Period For Any State Of Emergency Or Declaration Of Emergency Impact Area; To Prohibit Continuations Of Such Emergencies Except By Legislative Enactment; To Create New Section 41-39-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The State Department Of Health To Receive And Store Dead Human Bodies When The Governor Proclaims A State Of Emergency And Insufficient Facilities Exist In Counties And Municipalities To Receive And Store The Bodies; To Amend Sections 41-61-61 And 41-61-69, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Sections; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State of emergency; provide a maximum time period for and authorize Department of Health to store dead bodies if necessary.
Sponsors
Rep. Timmy Ladner [R] | Rep. Brady Williamson [R] | Rep. Dana Criswell [R] | Rep. Dan Eubanks [R] |
Rep. Chris Brown [R] | Rep. De Stamps [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |
2021-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-03 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed |
2021-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 15 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 15 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 61 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 61 | 69 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |