MS HB1325 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 935, Local And Private Laws Of 2016, As Amended By Chapter 960, Local And Private Laws Of 2018, To Extend The Date Of Repeal From July 1, 2030, To July 1, 2034, On The Provision Of Law That Authorizes The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Brandon, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Room Rentals From Hotels And Motels Within The City For The Purpose Of Funding An Amphitheatre And Other Ancillary Improvements; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Brandon; extend repealer on hotels/motel to fund amphitheater and other ancillary improvements.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Yancey [R] | Rep. Gene Newman [R] | Rep. Brent Powell [R] | Rep. Fred Shanks [R] |
Rep. Price Wallace [R] | Rep. Tom Weathersby [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 105 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 105 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-25 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Passed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2023-03-22 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2023-03-22 | House | Passed |
2023-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |