MS HB1315 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Repeal Sections 73-65-1 Through 73-65-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Create The Professional Art Therapists Advisory Council And Provide The Licensing Requirements For Professional Art Therapists; To Repeal Sections 73-4-1 Through 73-4-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Establish The Mississippi Auctioneers License Act, Create The Mississippi Auctioneer Commission And Provide The Licensing Requirements For Auctioneers; To Amend Section 75-27-215, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides That No Auctioneer Shall Be Permitted To Buy Cattle In His Name During The Period While Actually Engaged In Auctioneering, To Conform To The Preceding Section; To Repeal Sections 73-73-1 Through 73-73-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Establish The Mississippi Certified Interior Design Act, Create The Interior Design Advisory Committee And Provide The Licensing Requirements For Mississippi Certified Interior Designers; To Amend Sections 73-7-2, 73-7-7, 73-7-13 And 73-7-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove Any Licensing Requirement Or Regulation For A Wigologist Or Wig Specialist Within The Cosmetologist Licensing Law; To Bring Forward Section 73-22-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides Definitions In The Orthotics And Prosthetics Licensing Law, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; To Repeal Sections 73-67-1 Through 73-67-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Create The Mississippi Professional Massage Therapy Act And The State Board Of Massage Therapy; To Amend Section 73-55-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Establishes The Scope Of The Mississippi Athletic Trainers Licensure Act, To Conform To The Preceding Section; To Amend Section 75-60-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides Exemptions To The Commission On Proprietary School And College Registration, To Conform To The Preceding Sections; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational licenses; repeal those for art therapists, auctioneers, interior designers, wigologists and massage therapists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 74 N: 36 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateDied In Committee
2021-02-18SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2021-02-09HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-09HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2021-02-03HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Rushing, Boyd, Criswell)
2021-02-03HousePassed
2021-02-03HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2021-01-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73221New CodeSee Bill Text
7341Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73411Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73413Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73415Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73417Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73419Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73421Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73423Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73425Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73427Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73429Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
7343Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73431Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73433Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73435Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73437Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73439Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73441Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73443Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73445Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73447Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73449Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
7345Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73451Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
7347Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
7349Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
735515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73651Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736511Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736513Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736515Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736517Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73653Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73655Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73657Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73659Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73671Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736711Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736713Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736715Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736717Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736719Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736721Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736723Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736725Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736727Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736729Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73673Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736731Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736733Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736735Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736737Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
736739Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73675Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73677Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73679Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73713Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7372Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73729Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7377Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73731Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
737311Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
737313Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
737315Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
737317Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
737319Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
737321Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
737323Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
737325Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
737327Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
737329Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73733Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
737331Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
737333Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
737335Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73735Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73737Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73739Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
7527215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
75605Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback